El-Dalati, Mohammad Haysam (CPSO#: 50499)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bristol, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Oct 1989