El-Defrawy, Sherif Rashad (CPSO#: 61132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kensington Eye Institute
Suite 400
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 978-7931
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Defrawy Bates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. El-Defrawy ( CPSO# 61132 )
Dr. L. Bates ( CPSO# 60745 )

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
400 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (647) 621-6129

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (647) 621-6129

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Suite 5-142
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (647) 621-5973

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERIF RASHAD EL-DEFRAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-DEFRAWY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990