El-Gaddafi, Walid Fathi A (CPSO#: 82310)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Garyounis University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Apr 2005 to 10 Jul 2005
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 11 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Jul 2009 to 22 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2014