El-Helou, Philippe Philippe (CPSO#: 65074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Suite 300
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33998
Fax: (905) 523-7352
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philippe El-Helou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. El-Helou ( CPSO# 65074 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 300
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 03 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIPPE PHILIPPE EL-HELOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-HELOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2001