El-Houssein, Nagham Ali (CPSO#: 106249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medical Centre
150 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P1
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagham El-Houssein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. El-Houssein ( CPSO# 106249)

Business Address:
Family Medical Centre
150 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 945-5424

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGHAM ALI EL-HOUSSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-HOUSSEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017