El-Kholi, Vivian Magdy (CPSO#: 63108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57721
Fax: (905) 494-6710
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

mississauga sleep clinic
77 Queensway W, Suite 310
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Canada
Phone: 905-272-1114
Fax: 905-272-1147
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

40 Finchgate Blvd, Suite 216
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Canada
Phone: 905-456-3699
Fax: 905-456-8768
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. El-Kholi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2016


Corporation Name: V. El-Kholi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. El-Kholi ( CPSO# 63108 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6710

Business Address:
Mississauga Sleep Clinic
310 - 77 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 272-1114

Business Address:
216 - 40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 3J1
Phone Number: (905) 456-3699

Business Address:
205 - 1408 Ernst Avenue
London ON  N6E 3B2
Phone Number: (519) 688-6719

Business Address:
824 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G1
Phone Number: (519) 579-2002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN MAGDY EL-KHOLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KHOLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Nov 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jul 1997
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1997