El-Khoury, Bassam Michel (CPSO#: 61665)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2001