El-Maraghi, Robert Hassan (CPSO#: 73625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43305
Fax: (705) 739-5630
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert El-Maraghi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. El-Maraghi ( CPSO# 73625 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT HASSAN EL-MARAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-MARAGHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003