El-Messidi, Amira (CPSO#: 77483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital-Glen,McGill
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
Room C06.1184
1001 Decarie boulevard, Montreal
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 31658

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIRA EL-MESSIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-MESSIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009