El-Sawy, Reda Mohamed (CPSO#: 25301)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Filebank Record Centre Ltd., 488 Carlingview Drive, Etobicoke, ON M9W 6M8
Date Received: 20 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015