El-Sheikh, Yasser Salah (CPSO#: 81343)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 211
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: 416-782-7788
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasser El-Sheikh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. El-Sheikh ( CPSO# 81343 )

Business Address:
Unit 211
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 782-7788

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASSER SALAH EL-SHEIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SHEIKH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2010