ElSherif, Hanan El Sayed Abdelhamid (CPSO#: 94635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 2010

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 623-9350
Fax: (807) 623-8449
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St-Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Canada
Phone: 807-623-9350
Fax: 807-623-8449
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hassan Abdelmotleb ElSherif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. ElSherif ( CPSO# 94635 )
Dr. H. Hassan Abdelmotleb ( CPSO# 94629 )

Business Address:
984 Oliver Road
Suite 305
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 623-8419

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone Number: (807) 623-9350

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 14 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Hanan El Sayed Abdelhamid ElSherif may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal
                        Medicine,  Division  of  Clinical Sciences, at the Northern Ontario
                        School  of  Medicine,  in which  Dr.  ElSherif  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires when Dr. ElSherif
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note: This  certificate  expires  on  June  30,  2022.   Upon  renewal  of  Dr.
                  ElSherif's  academic  appointment  at  the  Northern  Ontario  School  of
                  Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the  limitations in
                  paragraph 2 above.