El-Solh, Hassan Mohammed Bashir (CPSO#: 53508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
American University of Beirut
Medical Center
Medical Center Director
Beirut 1107 2020
Lebanon
Phone: (961) 136-2126

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Lebanon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN MOHAMMED BASHIR EL-SOLH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SOLH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1988