El-Takli, Issam Khalil (CPSO#: 69916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 11
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El Takli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. El-Takli ( CPSO# 69916 )

Business Address:
Unit 11
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-6362

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 2E9
Phone Number: (416) 747-3500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISSAM KHALIL EL-TAKLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-TAKLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2001