El-Tawil, Mohamed Said Mohamed (CPSO#: 67502)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mansoura University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1998