El-Yaman, Mohammed Maroof (CPSO#: 57627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tawam hospital
Tawam St
Al Ain 15258
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 971504496262

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED MAROOF EL-YAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-YAMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Mar 1993
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1991