Elalouf, Ofir Mordechai (CPSO#: 110848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 04 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5753
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OFIR MORDECHAI ELALOUF may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ELALOUF is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ELALOUF shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ELALOUF is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ELALOUF shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ELALOUF ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ELALOUF ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 03 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 04 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018