Elantholi Parameswaran, Saibishkumar (CPSO#: 84856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Apr 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Calicut University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Unit 5-808
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2919
Fax: (416) 946-4586
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elantholi Parameswaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Oct 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Saibishkumar Elantholi Parameswaran may practise medicine independently in
            radiation oncology.