Elarabi, Mohamed Farouk Radwan (CPSO#: 97707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2015

Expiry Date:  10 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 406
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 525-0255
Fax: 9055259764
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - Resident - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Mohamed Farouk Radwan Elarabi may practise rheumatology in Hamilton,
                  Ontario,  while  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College, at the following locations:

                  (i)   at the office located at 25 Carlton Avenue East;
                  
                  (ii)  with Hamilton Health Sciences; and
                  
                  (iii) with St. Joseph's Healthcare - Hamilton. 
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on March 10, 2018.

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Elarabi's knowledge, skill, judgment or  attitude, does not provide
                        the  required reports to the College by the  due  date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Elarabi's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the  College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Elarabi's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is  issued on September 11, 2015, and will expire on or
                  before March 10, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.