Elavathil, Leelamma Jacob (CPSO#: 50479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Department Of Pathology
1230 North Shore Blvd. E
Burlington, ON
Hamilton ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: 905-632-3737 Ext. 1228
Fax: 905-336-6483
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 9058487200
Fax: (905) 813-4132
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 29 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEELAMMA JACOB ELAVATHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAVATHIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1984