Elbaz, Zeinab Sobhy Abdel Hamid (CPSO#: 64277)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1995

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Clinic for Person-
Centered Psychotherapy
265 Yorkland blvd, unit 403
Toronto ON  M2J 1S5
Phone: 416-229-2399
Fax: 416-229-9771
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZEINAB SOBHY ABDEL HAMID ELBAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELBAZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: December 8, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Non-Ontario Disciplinary Finding:

Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

Dr. Elbaz was found guilty of professional misconduct by the New York State Board for Professional Medical Conduct due to Dr. Elbaz having been convicted on April 19, 2013 of the class A misdemeanor crime of criminal mischief in the fourth degree under New York State law. The finding of professional misconduct was made on November 30, 2015 and was effective as of December 8, 2015. Dr. Elbaz’s licence to practice medicine in the State of New York has been suspended for 6 months, and thereafter, is on probation for 2 years. The CPSO was notified of this finding by a report dated December 15, 2015.

Update (July 14, 2016): The New York Professional Medical Conduct Administrative Review Board ("ARB") reviewed the State Board's decision. In an Order dated April 12, 2016, the ARB affirmed the State Board's determination that Dr. Elbaz committed professional misconduct and the license suspension, but overturned the probation penalty. The CPSO was notified of this ARB decision by a report dated April 29, 2016.