Elbaz-Greener, Tomer (CPSO#: 107144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Technion-Israel Institute of Technology, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
441-600 University Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M5G 1X5
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 8236
Fax: (416) 619-5524
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMER ELBAZ-GREENER may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ELBAZ-GREENER is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ELBAZ-GREENER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ELBAZ-GREENER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ELBAZ-GREENER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ELBAZ-GREENER ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ELBAZ-GREENER ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018