Elbreki, Mustafa M (CPSO#: 75362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2475 Mcdougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone: (519) 966-3888
Fax: (519) 967-8882
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mustafa Elbreki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elbreki ( CPSO# 75362 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
2475 McDougall Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 966-3888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUSTAFA M ELBREKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELBREKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006