Elden, Lisa Melinda (CPSO#: 59940)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2002