Elder, Beverly Anne (CPSO#: 52657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 525-0255
Fax: (905) 525-9764
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Scocchia and B. Elder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Scocchia ( CPSO# 58626 )
Dr. B. Elder ( CPSO# 52657 )

Business Address:
Suite 406
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 525-0255

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLY ANNE ELDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007