Elder, Brian Ross (CPSO#: 59562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4773
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Elder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Elder ( CPSO# 59562 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4773

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN ROSS ELDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989