Elder, Janice Lorraine (CPSO#: 59416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KMH Diagnostic Centre
123 Edward St
Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5R 1E2
Phone: 416-597-1016
Fax: 877-564-3297
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joint Department of Medical Imaging
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 8233
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Joint Department of Medical Imaging
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 4411
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janice Elder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Elder ( CPSO# 59416 )

Business Address:
600 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5R 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-1016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE LORRAINE ELDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1990