Eldridge, Karen-Lee (CPSO#: 60719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 743-3804
Fax: (705) 872-4357
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen-Lee Eldridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Eldridge ( CPSO# 60719 )

Business Address:
Unit 202
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone Number: (705) 743-3804

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN-LEE ELDRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1990