Elepano, Suzanne M (CPSO#: 71554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City Centre Medical Clinic
Suite 130
5 Park Home Avenue
Willowdale ON  M2N 6L4
Phone: (416) 730-9588
Fax: (416) 590-9371
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE M ELEPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELEPANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999