Elfassy, Sam (CPSO#: 86519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 513
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 766-3401
Fax: (416) 766-5076
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sam Elfassy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elfassy ( CPSO# 86519 )

Business Address:
Suite 513
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 766-3401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAM ELFASSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELFASSY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011