Elfirjani, Ali Salem Bilgasim (CPSO#: 76859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakerdige Health System
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N5
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elfirjani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elfirjani ( CPSO# 76859 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI SALEM BILGASIM ELFIRJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELFIRJANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2004 to 29 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2007