Elford, Kimberly Joy-Ann (CPSO#: 72082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Fertility and
Women's Health Centre
B 1 - B 2
627 Lyons Lane
Oakville ON  L6J 5Z7
Phone: (905) 844-7238
Fax: (905) 844-7256
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

One Fertility
3210 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3T1
Canada
Phone: (905) 634-4440
Fax: (905) 639-3810
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly Elford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Elford ( CPSO# 72082 )

Business Address:
Isis Oakville
B 1 and B 2
627 Lyons Lane
Oakville ON  L6J 5Z7
Phone Number: (905) 844-7238

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY JOY-ANN ELFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELFORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Feb 1998 to 03 Apr 1998
Elective Trainee - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 09 Jun 1999 to 29 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2002 to 01 Mar 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000