Elgamal, Akram Shawky (CPSO#: 69779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
318B-395 Carrie St.
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone: (519) 245-8392
Fax: (519) 245-8305
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

595 Bradley ave.
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-7229
Fax: (519) 685-3085
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elgamal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elgamal ( CPSO# 69779 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 318B
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-8392

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 685-7229

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKRAM SHAWKY ELGAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELGAMAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 08 Feb 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1998