Elhilali, Mostafa Mohamed (CPSO#: 33287)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 19 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2013