Elias, Andrew Michael (CPSO#: 95968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Elias Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elias ( CPSO# 95968 )

Business Address:
888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa ON  K2C 3R2
Phone Number: (613) 228-2882

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW MICHAEL ELIAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014