Eliasson, Teresa Elizabeth Cassy (CPSO#: 69553)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2004