Elit, Lorraine Margaret (CPSO#: 53969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: 905 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elit Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Elit ( CPSO# 53969 )

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORRAINE MARGARET ELIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1991