Ellabib, Mohamed Emhemmed (CPSO#: 83812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HAMAD GENERAL HOSPITAL
TRAUMA SURGERY DEPARTMENT
ALRAYYAN STREET
DOHA PO.BOX3050
Qatar
Phone: 0097450400898

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Libya
New Brunswick
Qatar

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED EMHEMMED ELLABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLABIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 27 Oct 2005 to 26 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 27 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 27 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010