Elliott, David Stuart (CPSO#: 22763)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2003