Elliott, Deborah Lynn (CPSO#: 50501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services
CFB Kingston
PO Box 17000, Stn Forces
Kingston Ont
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541 5010 Ext. 5776
Fax: (613) 541 4607
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Elliott ( CPSO# 50501 )

Business Address:
33 CFHSvs
CFB Kingston
PO Box 17000
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1984