Elliott, Denise Marie (CPSO#: 69934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Bond, Denise Marie (used until: 06 Sep 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6A-146
140 Promenade du Portage
Gatineau QC  K1A 0J9
Phone: (819) 654-2762
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 803
3105 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2H 5A6
Canada
Phone: (819) 654-2762
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Elliott ( CPSO# 69934 )
Dr. A. Elliott ( CPSO# 73626 )

Business Address:
Queensway - Carleton Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE MARIE ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998