Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Elliott, James Arthur (CPSO#: 30472)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015