Elliott, John Francis (CPSO#: 22922)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1995