Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Elliott, Maria Esther (CPSO#: 65680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Siena, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4458
Fax: (416) 340-4198
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Psychiatry
Community Mental Health
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2089
Fax: (416) 603-5490
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esther Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elliott ( CPSO# 65680 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hosptial
Department of Psychiatry
Room 8-240
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4458

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA ESTHER ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999