Elliott, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 12503)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1991