Elliott, Wade Charles (CPSO#: 71140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Elliott Sports Medicine Clinic
Suite 102
1100 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2G3
Phone: (905) 336-3340
Fax: (905) 336-6095
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Henderson General Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wade Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 4 2009


Corporation Name: Drs. W & L Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Elliott ( CPSO# 72530 )
Dr. W. Elliott ( CPSO# 71140 )

Business Address:
Levy Elliot Sports Medicine Clinic
102 - 1100 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2G3
Phone Number: (905) 336-3340

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Suite 302
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N8
Phone Number: (289) 217-7947


Corporation Name: Dr. Wade C. Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Elliott ( CPSO# 71140 )

Business Address:
The Elliot Sports Medicine Clinic
Suite 102
1100 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2G3
Phone Number: (905) 336-3340

Business Address:
Henderson General Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
159 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 309-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WADE CHARLES ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000