Ellis, Anne Kathleen (CPSO#: 73615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Allergy & Immunology
Doran 1
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2336
Fax: (613) 546-3079
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Ellis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ellis ( CPSO# 73615 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Doran 1 - Division of Allergy & Immunology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2336

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 16 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE KATHLEEN ELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006