Ellis, Jack Mackenzie (CPSO#: 33460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
44 Walnut St
St Thomas
Ontario
St Thomas ON  N5R 2Y8
Phone: (519) 319-1831
Fax: (519) 633-6319
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care,St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK MACKENZIE ELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982