Ellis, Paul Douglas (CPSO#: 65325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RFE-GS,Room 434
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 11 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL DOUGLAS ELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993