Ellis, Peter Michael (CPSO#: 75719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 23 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
HHS - Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 64609
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 28 Oct 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL ELLIS may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF ONCOLOGY, DIVISION OF MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. ELLIS holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. ELLIS may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. ELLIS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Oct 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Aug 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Oct 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2005